EP0182524 - Hinge arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.1990 [1990/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg D-35745 Herborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
White, Graham Ian 23, Lambourne Road West End Southampton Hampshire S03 3LS / GB | 02 /
Lynham, Christopher John 35, Tennyson Road Eastleigh Hampshire S05 5FS / GB | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/22] | Application number, filing date | 85307831.9 | 29.10.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | GB19840027765 | 02.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8427765 | GB19850003870 | 15.02.1985 Original published format: GB 8503870 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0182524 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0182524 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E05D7/12, E05D5/02 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
E05D7/12 (EP,US);
E05D5/02 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/22] | Title | German: | Scharniereinrichtung | [1986/22] | English: | Hinge arrangement | [1986/22] | French: | Dispositif de charnière | [1986/22] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 11.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE310246 ; | [A]US3311944 (PAUL DUFEK); | [A]US3745607 (CLEFF H); | [A]DE2458045 (INTERLUEBKE KG); | [A]US4102011 (CLACK JR FREDERICK ARGLES) |