EP0181158 - Slot machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA UNIVERSAL 561, Oaza Arai Oyama-shi, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1986/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okada, Kazuo c/o K. K. Universal 1-7-7 Horidome-cho Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1986/20] | Representative(s) | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85307907.7 | 31.10.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | JP19840165687U | 02.11.1984 Original published format: JP 16568784 U | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181158 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181158 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G07F17/34 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
G07F17/34 (EP,US);
A63F2001/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/20] | Title | German: | Geldspielautomat | [1986/20] | English: | Slot machine | [1986/20] | French: | Machine de jeu | [1986/20] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/36: Teilanmeldung 90306865.8 eingereicht am 31/10/85 | EPB 1990/36: Divisional application 90306865.8 filed on 31/10/85 | EPB 1990/36: Demande divisionnaire 90306865.8 déposée le 31/10/85 | Examination procedure | 07.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/19] | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/19] | Divisional application(s) | EP90306865.8 / EP0398767 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1991 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1231131 ; | [A]GB1268104 (BERIOLA MACHINE COMPANY PTY LT [AU]); | [A]US3876208 (WACHTLER GUNTER, et al); | [A]DE2425516 (HIGSON WILFRED); | [A]EP0060018 (BARCREST LTD [GB]) |