EP0181756 - Improvements relating to double-diaphragm pumps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLOTRONICS AG Chamerstrasse 52 CH-6300 Zug / CH | [1986/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marchant, Derek Noel 11 Wolstonbury Close Hurstpierpoint Sussex / GB | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Brooke-Smith, Fred, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | [1986/21] | Application number, filing date | 85308000.0 | 04.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | GB19840028013 | 06.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8428013 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181756 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181756 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/06, F01L25/06 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
F01L25/066 (EP,US);
F01L25/063 (EP,US);
F04B43/0736 (EP,US);
F04B9/135 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/21] | Title | German: | Doppelmembranpumpen | [1986/21] | English: | Improvements relating to double-diaphragm pumps | [1986/21] | French: | Pompes à diaphragmes à double effet | [1986/21] | Examination procedure | 08.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 04.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.11.1986 | M02   Fee paid on   08.12.1986 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.1989 | BE | 15.03.1989 | CH | 15.03.1989 | IT | 15.03.1989 | LI | 15.03.1989 | NL | 15.03.1989 | SE | 15.03.1989 | LU | 30.11.1989 | [2007/44] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 15.03.1989 | |
BE | 15.03.1989 | ||
CH | 15.03.1989 | ||
IT | 15.03.1989 | ||
LI | 15.03.1989 | ||
NL | 15.03.1989 | ||
SE | 15.03.1989 | ||
LU | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 15.03.1989 | |
BE | 15.03.1989 | ||
CH | 15.03.1989 | ||
IT | 15.03.1989 | ||
LI | 15.03.1989 | ||
NL | 15.03.1989 | ||
SE | 15.03.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | AT | 15.03.1989 | |
BE | 15.03.1989 | ||
CH | 15.03.1989 | ||
LI | 15.03.1989 | ||
NL | 15.03.1989 | ||
SE | 15.03.1989 | ||
Former [1990/09] | AT | 15.03.1989 | |
CH | 15.03.1989 | ||
LI | 15.03.1989 | ||
NL | 15.03.1989 | ||
SE | 15.03.1989 | ||
Former [1990/04] | CH | 15.03.1989 | |
LI | 15.03.1989 | ||
NL | 15.03.1989 | ||
SE | 15.03.1989 | ||
Former [1990/01] | NL | 15.03.1989 | |
SE | 15.03.1989 | ||
Former [1989/36] | SE | 15.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1426535 ; | [A]US3838946 (SCHALL R); | [A]WO8402557 (SILVA ETHAN A) | Examination | EP0061704 | EP0104847 |