EP0181193 - X-ray irradiation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.1991 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMPSHIRE INSTRUMENTS, INC 10, Carlson Road Monroe New York / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/20] | For all designated states HAMPSHIRE INSTRUMENTS, INC 10, Carlson Road Monroe New York / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Forsyth, James Morton 54 Old Forge Lane Pittsford New York 14534 / US | [1990/37] |
Former [1986/20] | 01 /
Forsyth, Jamers Morton 54 Old Forge Lane Pittsford New York 14534 / US | Representative(s) | Miller, Joseph, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | [1986/20] | Application number, filing date | 85308028.1 | 05.11.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | US19840669440 | 08.11.1984 Original published format: US 669440 | [1986/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0181193 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0181193 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181193 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/00, G03F7/20 | [1986/20] | CPC: |
H05G2/001 (EP);
B82Y10/00 (EP);
G03F7/70033 (EP);
G03F7/70916 (EP);
G21B1/19 (EP);
Y02E30/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/20] | Title | German: | Bestrahlungsvorrichtung mit Röntgenstrahlen | [1986/20] | English: | X-ray irradiation system | [1986/20] | French: | Dispositif d'irradiation par rayons X | [1986/20] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 06.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.09.1990 | BE | 12.09.1990 | CH | 12.09.1990 | IT | 12.09.1990 | LI | 12.09.1990 | SE | 12.09.1990 | LU | 30.11.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.09.1990 | |
BE | 12.09.1990 | ||
CH | 12.09.1990 | ||
IT | 12.09.1990 | ||
LI | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/42] | AT | 12.09.1990 | |
BE | 12.09.1990 | ||
CH | 12.09.1990 | ||
LI | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/35] | BE | 12.09.1990 | |
CH | 12.09.1990 | ||
LI | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/32] | CH | 12.09.1990 | |
LI | 12.09.1990 | ||
SE | 12.09.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 12.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3743842 (SMITH H, et al); | [AD]US4184078 (NAGEL DAVID J [US], et al); | [A]US4344013 (LEDLEY ROBERT S); | [A]EP0058137 (BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 47, no. 6, June 1976, pages 2402-2414, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; K. EIDMANN et al.: "X-ray emission from laser-irradiated plane solid targets" | [A] - SOVIET JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. 9, no. 2, February 1979, pages 251-254, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; Yu.A. BYKOVSKIL et al.: "Characteristics of soft x-ray emission from a plasma formed by moderate-intensity laser irradiation of a target" | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 23, no. 9, 1st May 1984, pages 1428-1433, New York, US; D.J. NAGEL et al.: "Repetitively pulsed-plasma soft x-ray source" |