EP0182619 - Improvements in or relating to manufacture of building blocks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIP CHEMICALS LIMITED 20 St. Mary's Parsonage Manchester M3 2NL / GB | [1986/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogden, Dennis Henry 167 Goldthorne Hill Penn Wolverhampton Staffs / GB | [1986/22] | Representative(s) | Hadfield, Robert Franklin, et al Manchester International Office Centre, Styal Road Manchester M22 5TN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/22] | Hadfield, Robert Franklin, et al Bowdon House PO Box 20 Ashburton Road West Trafford Park Manchester M17 1RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308308.7 | 14.11.1985 | [1986/22] | Priority number, date | GB19840029558 | 22.11.1984 Original published format: GB 8429558 | GB19850004398 | 20.02.1985 Original published format: GB 8504398 | GB19850004399 | 20.02.1985 Original published format: GB 8504399 | [1986/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0182619 | Date: | 28.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0182619 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B28B7/36, B28B7/34, B28B7/30 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
B28B7/183 (EP);
B28B7/303 (EP);
B28B7/348 (EP);
B28B7/364 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, NL [1986/22] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Baublöcken | [1986/22] | English: | Improvements in or relating to manufacture of building blocks | [1986/22] | French: | Fabrication de blocs de construction | [1986/22] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/44] | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1584595 ; | [X]DE2444715 ; | [A]BE387678 ; | [A]DE1238829 ; | [A]DE1074849 ; | [A]FR809116 |