EP0184398 - Analog-to-digital conversion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1992 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states RCA CORPORATION 201 Washington Road Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willis, Donald Henry 5175 E. 74th Place Indianapolis Indiana 46250 / US | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1988/23] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | ||
Former [1986/34] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald RCA International Limited Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | ||
Former [1986/24] | Pratt, Richard Wilson c/o RCA International Limited Norfolk House 31 St. James's Square London, SW1Y 4JR / GB | Application number, filing date | 85308700.5 | 29.11.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | US19840677523 | 03.12.1984 Original published format: US 677523 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0184398 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0184398 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184398 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/20, H04N9/455 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
H03M1/201 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (KR);
H04N19/90 (EP,US);
H03M1/365 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/24] | H03M1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Analog-Digital-Umsetzung | [1986/24] | English: | Analog-to-digital conversion | [1986/24] | French: | Conversion analogique-numérique | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 25.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2625604 (EDSON JAMES O); | [Y]GB997715 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD); | [A]US3739082 (LIPPEL B); | [Y]US3949170 (SHIONOYA TOSHIO); | [A]GB2013053 (ROLM CORP); | [A]FR2497616 (TEKTRONIX INC [US]) |