EP0186387 - An internal-reflection-interference semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Osamu 627-188, 2-chome Shichijo-nishimachi Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Hiroshi 5-8, 11-chome Nagamodai Kamo-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Morimoto, Taiji 989-4, Hokkeji-shinmachi Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Saburo 1-2-11, Akanedai Haibara-cho Uda-gun Nara-ken / JP | [1986/27] | Representative(s) | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/27] | Kosmin, Gerald Emmanuel, et al HASELTINE, LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85309030.6 | 12.12.1985 | [1986/27] | Priority number, date | JP19840265079 | 15.12.1984 Original published format: JP 26507984 | [1986/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0186387 | Date: | 02.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0186387 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0186387 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/082, H01S3/085, H01S3/19 | [1991/17] | CPC: |
H01S3/082 (EP,US);
H01S5/10 (EP,US);
H01S5/1021 (EP,US);
H01S5/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/27] | H01S3/23, H01S3/08, H01S3/19 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1986/27] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaservorrichtung mit einem inneren Reflektor, der Interferenz verursacht | [1986/27] | English: | An internal-reflection-interference semiconductor laser device | [1986/27] | French: | Dispositif laser à semi-conducteur avec un réflecteur interne provoquant une interférence | [1986/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 19.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4284963 (ALLEN JR LOUIS B, et al); | [Y]US4092659 (ETTENBERG MICHAEL); | [Y]US4163953 (DYMENT JOHN C [CA], et al); | [A]US4608697 (COLDREN LARRY A [US]); | [A]US4488307 (GARMIRE ELSA M [US], et al) | [A] - Applied Physics Letters, Vol. 40, No. 7, April 1, 1982, New York CHOI: "Semiconductor Internal Reflection-Interference Laser" pages 571-573 |