EP0189665 - Machine translation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doi, Miwako c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1986/32] | Representative(s) | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al Marks & Clerk Incorporating Edward Evans Barker 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/32] | Freed, Arthur Woolf, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 85309268.2 | 19.12.1985 | [1986/32] | Priority number, date | JP19840271808 | 25.12.1984 Original published format: JP 27180884 | [1986/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0189665 | Date: | 06.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189665 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/38 | [1986/32] | CPC: |
G06F40/242 (EP,US);
G06F40/44 (EP,US);
G06F40/47 (EP,US);
G06F40/55 (EP,US);
G06F40/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/45] |
Former [1986/32] | DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | System zur maschinellen Übersetzung | [1986/32] | English: | Machine translation system | [1986/32] | French: | Système pour la traduction par machine | [1986/32] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/49] | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4193119 (ARASE SHINGO [US], et al); | [A]US4460973 (TANIMOTO AKIRA [JP], et al); | [A]FR2101495 (BAILLIE ANDRE); | [A]EP0081784 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | Examination | EP0012777 | EP0175357 | EP0138169 | - AFIPS JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE, Dallas, 13-16th June 1977, vol. 46, pages 789-790, Montvale, US; D.A. LUTHER et al.: "An interactive text-editing system in support of Russian translation by machine" | - Fujitsu-Scientifics & Technical Journal, vol. 18 (1982) n.1, Kawasaki, Japan, Sawai et al.: "Knowledge Representation and Machine Translation" pages117-133. |