EP0187532 - Video signal reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 22.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urata, Kaoru c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1986/29] | Application number, filing date | 85309497.7 | 24.12.1985 | [1986/29] | Priority number, date | JP19840276826 | 29.12.1984 Original published format: JP 27682684 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0187532 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0187532 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/80, H04N9/88 | [1988/33] | CPC: |
H04N9/88 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/29] | H04N9/80 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1986/29] | Title | German: | Videosignalwiedergabevorrichtung | [1986/29] | English: | Video signal reproducing apparatus | [1986/29] | French: | Appareil de reproduction du signal vidéo | [1986/29] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/08] | 29.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1991/41] | 23.05.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP59188290 [ ]; | [A]JP59188290 ; | [A]FR2542955 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]); | [A]GB2071960 (RCA CORP) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 47 (E-299)[1770], 27th February 1985; & JP - A - 59 188 290, & JP - A - 58 62750 (Cat. D), & JP59188290 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 47 (E-299)[1770], 27th February 1985; & JP-A-59 188 290 (SONY) 25-10-1984, & JP-A-58 062 750 (Cat. D), & JP59188290 A 00000000 |