EP0151055 - Apparatus for the galvanic recovery of metals from diluted solutions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heroguelle, Yves 3 Place Toulouse Lautrec F-51100 Reims / FR | [1985/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Loyer, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Loyer & Abello 9, rue de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | Loyer, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400015.5 | 07.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | FR19840000203 | 09.01.1984 Original published format: FR 8400203 | FR19840018992 | 13.12.1984 Original published format: FR 8418992 | [1985/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151055 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151055 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151055 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C25C7/00, C25C7/02 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
C25C7/00 (EP,US);
C25C7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtungen zur galvanischen Gewinnung von Metallen aus verdünnten Lösungen | [1985/32] | English: | Apparatus for the galvanic recovery of metals from diluted solutions | [1985/32] | French: | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs de récupération galvanique de métaux en solutions diluées | [1985/32] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 03.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.08.1988 | NL | 31.08.1988 | SE | 31.08.1988 | BE | 31.01.1989 | CH | 31.01.1989 | LI | 31.01.1989 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.08.1988 | |
NL | 31.08.1988 | ||
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
CH | 31.01.1989 | ||
LI | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1990/16] | NL | 31.08.1988 | |
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
CH | 31.01.1989 | ||
LI | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1989/39] | NL | 31.08.1988 | |
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
BE | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1989/24] | NL | 31.08.1988 | |
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/12] | NL | 31.08.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2390516 (PACKER ELLIOT [US]); | [Y]GB1598306 (KODAK LTD); | [A]US4367127 (MESSING GILBERT S, et al); | [A]US3859195 (WILLIAMS JOHN M); | [A]US4097347 (PACKER ELLIOT L); | [A]GB2052559 (KODAK LTD); | [A]EP0079058 (DIAMOND SHAMROCK CORP [US]) | Examination | EP0129845 |