EP0152317 - Boiler for wood with a preheating chamber for the fuel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tabel, René Le Croizet 15000 Aurillac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | For all designated states Tabel, René Saint Hubert Goulles F-19430 Mercoeur / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Chanet, Jacques Conseil en Brevets 129 Avenue de Royat B.P. 27 63400 Chamalières / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Chanet, Jacques Conseil en Brevets 129 Avenue de Royat B.P. 27 F-63400 Chamalières / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400093.2 | 18.01.1985 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | FR19840001083 | 18.01.1984 Original published format: FR 8401083 | [1985/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152317 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152317 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F23B1/16, F23B1/36, F23B1/14, F24B5/02 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
F23B7/005 (EP);
F23B1/16 (EP);
F23B1/36 (EP);
F23G7/105 (EP);
F24B5/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Heizkessel für Holz mit einer Vorheizkammer für den Brennstoff | [1985/34] | English: | Boiler for wood with a preheating chamber for the fuel | [1985/34] | French: | Chaudière comportant une chambre de préchauffage du comburant | [1985/34] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 27.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.02.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.08.1988 | GB | 31.08.1988 | IT | 31.08.1988 | NL | 31.08.1988 | SE | 31.08.1988 | LU | 31.01.1989 | [2007/52] |
Former [2000/03] | AT | 31.08.1988 | |
GB | 31.08.1988 | ||
IT | 31.08.1988 | ||
NL | 31.08.1988 | ||
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
LU | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1999/52] | AT | 31.08.1988 | |
IT | 31.08.1988 | ||
NL | 31.08.1988 | ||
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
LU | 31.01.1989 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 31.08.1988 | |
IT | 31.08.1988 | ||
NL | 31.08.1988 | ||
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | AT | 31.08.1988 | |
NL | 31.08.1988 | ||
SE | 31.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 31.08.1988 | |
NL | 31.08.1988 | ||
Former [1989/12] | NL | 31.08.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE134819 ; | [A]US2956527 (HOPWOOD WILLIAM E); | [A]FR1412133 (GOETAVERKEN AB); | [Y]GB2093960 (HOLDEN WILLIAM J); | [Y]FR2512176 (NAU RENE [FR]) |