EP0151077 - Matrix image addressing circuit including shift registers formed of static memories and addressing method with such a circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bisotto, Sylvette 3 rue Bach Le Fontanil-Cornillon F-38120 Saint Egreve / FR | 02 /
Blanc, Jean-Philippe 50, rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau F-38400 Saint Martin d'Heres / FR | 03 /
Bodin, Bernard 31, Le Plaçage F-38360 Sassenage / FR | 04 /
Poujois, Robert Les Jaillets F-38650 Sinard / FR | [1985/32] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/32] | Application number, filing date | 85400126.0 | 25.01.1985 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | FR19840001479 | 31.01.1984 Original published format: FR 8401479 | [1985/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151077 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151077 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G11C8/00 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
G09G3/3688 (EP,US);
G09G3/3674 (EP,US);
G09G3/3681 (EP,US);
G11C19/188 (EP,US);
G09G3/2011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/32] | Title | German: | Adressierschaltung eines Matrixbildschirms mit aus statischen Speichern gebildeten Schieberegistern und Adressierverfahren mit einer solchen Schaltung | [1985/32] | English: | Matrix image addressing circuit including shift registers formed of static memories and addressing method with such a circuit | [1985/32] | French: | Circuit d'adressage d'un imageur matriciel comportant des registres à décalage formés de mémoires statiques et procédé d'adressage avec un tel circuit | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 17.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 22.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 17.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.03.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1988/32] | 20.03.1988 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4393482 (YAMADA KUNIHIRO [JP]); | [A]US4330852 (REDWINE DONALD J, et al) | [A] - NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, NTZ, vol. 33, no. 2, février 1980, partie 1, pages 80-88, Berlin, DE; A. FISCHER: "Flache Fernseh-Bildschirme" | [A] - E.A. ZUIDERVEEN: "Handbuch der digitalen Schaltungen", 1981, pages 104-108, Franzis' Verlag, Munich, DE. |