EP0156667 - Blast cleaning apparatus for buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomann, Chantal 7 Chemin de l'Escalette F-30700 Uzes / FR | [1985/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Derambure, Christian Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1987/47] | Derambure, Christian BUGNION ASSOCIES 55, rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/40] | Cabinet Pierre HERRBURGER 115, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400256.5 | 14.02.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | FR19840003171 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8403171 | [1985/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0156667 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156667 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/00, B24C3/06 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
E04G23/002 (EP,US);
B24C3/062 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Druck-Reinigungsvorrichtung für Gebäude | [1988/21] | English: | Blast cleaning apparatus for buildings | [1985/40] | French: | Installation pour le ravalement de bâtiments | [1985/40] |
Former [1985/40] | Druck-Reinigungsvorrichtung für Gebaüde | Examination procedure | 20.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 10.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2729918 (DENBURGH WILLIAM N VAN); | [A]FR1414659 ; | [A]FR1557648 ; | [A]FR2146075 (HAMMELMANN PAUL) |