EP0159210 - Optical device for surface proximity detection and its application to the retrieval of a surface profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [1985/43] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lerat, Bernard 4 Bis, rue Pierre Lescot F-91430 Igny / FR | [1985/43] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/43] | Application number, filing date | 85400334.0 | 22.02.1985 | [1985/43] | Priority number, date | FR19840003168 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8403168 | [1985/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159210 | Date: | 23.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159210 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G01B11/24, G01B11/14 | [1985/43] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
B23K9/1274 (EP,US);
G01B11/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/43] | Title | German: | Optische Vorrichtung zum Messen der Annäherung an einer Fläche und Verfahren zum Wiedergewinnen des Profils einer solchen Fläche | [1985/43] | English: | Optical device for surface proximity detection and its application to the retrieval of a surface profile | [1985/43] | French: | Dispositif optique de mesure de proximité de surface et son application au relevé du profil d'une surface | [1985/43] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 05.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4088408 (BURCHER ERNEST E, et al); | [Y]US3986774 (LOWREY JR ORVEY P, et al); | [A]US3719421 (POILLEUX J, et al); | [A]DE3110073 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4298286 (MAXEY CARL W, et al); | [A]US3885872 (HOWE JR JAMES J, et al); | [A]US4355904 (BALASUBRAMANIAN N) |