EP0161947 - Integrated circuit having a fuse circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.07.1992 [1992/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunitoki, Tadayoshi 23-10, Umegaoka Midori-Ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | 02 /
Gotoh, Kunihiko 46-2-3-403, Fujimidai 2-chome Kunitachi-shi Tokyo 186 / JP | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400383.7 | 28.02.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | JP19840037927 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3792784 | [1985/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161947 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161947 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161947 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11C17/00, G11C17/16 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
G11C17/16 (EP,US);
H01L27/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1985/47] | G11C17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/47] | Title | German: | Integrierte Schaltung mit einer Schmelzsicherungsschaltung | [1985/47] | English: | Integrated circuit having a fuse circuit | [1985/47] | French: | Circuit intégré comprenant un circuit fusible | [1985/47] | Examination procedure | 19.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 21.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4329685 (MAHON MICHAEL J, et al) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 15, no. 8, January 1973, pages 2371-2372, New York, US; P.W. COOK et al.: "Read-only memory fabrication by laser formed connections" |