EP0161952 - Process for inducing a state to an article, made from a memory shape alloy with two reversible memory states [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/47] | Process for inducing a state to an article, made from a memory shape alloy with two reversible memory states, and article obtained in this way | ||
[1991/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOURIAU ET CIE 9-13, rue du Général Galliéni 92103 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | For all designated states SOURIAU ET CIE 9-13, rue du Général Galliéni F-92103 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rizzo, Gilles 27, Rue Pierron F-94000 Creteil / FR | 02 /
Dubertret, Alain 30, rue Edouard La Ferieres F-92310 Sevres / FR | 03 /
Guenin, Gérard 15, rue du Bourbonnais F-69330 Meyzieu / FR | [1985/47] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/47] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400523.8 | 19.03.1985 | [1985/47] | Priority number, date | FR19840005815 | 12.04.1984 Original published format: FR 8405815 | [1985/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0161952 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0161952 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0161952 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C22C9/01, C22C9/06, C22F1/08, H01R13/193 | [1985/47] | CPC: |
C22F1/006 (EP,US);
H01R4/01 (EP,US);
F16B2200/77 (EP,US);
H01R43/16 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12903 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bedienung eines Zustands zu einem Gegenstand auf eine Formgedächtnislegierung mit zwei reversiblen Gedächtniszuständen | [1991/20] | English: | Process for inducing a state to an article, made from a memory shape alloy with two reversible memory states | [1991/20] | French: | Procédé de conditionnement d'un object en alliage métallique à mémoire de forme à deux états de mémoire de forme réversibles | [1991/20] |
Former [1985/47] | Verfahren zur Bedienung eines Zustands zu einem Gegenstand auf eine Formgedächtnislegierung mit zwei reversiblen Gedächtniszuständen und Gegenstand auf diese Weise hergestellt | ||
Former [1985/47] | Process for inducing a state to an article, made from a memory shape alloy with two reversible memory states, and article obtained in this way | ||
Former [1985/47] | Procédé de conditionnement d'un object en alliage métallique à mémoire de forme à deux états de mémoire de forme réversibles et objet ainsi obtenu | Examination procedure | 13.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 11.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2144348 (RAYCHEM CORP); | [Y]FR2301602 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [X]FR2301604 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0081372 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [Y]US4435229 (JOHNSON ALFRED D [US]); | [AP]EP0105733 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) | Examination | US4205293 | - " The remarkable shape-memory alloys ", JEE, September 1983, p. 89-93 | - Petit Robert p. 748, 1490, 2111 |