EP0165106 - Semiconductor memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takemae, Yoshihiro 8-13-24-303, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Tomio 12-404, 1-11-2, Shirahatadai Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP | 03 /
Sato, Kimiaki 4-11-35-204, Minamiazabu Minato-ku Tokyo 106 / JP | [1985/51] | Representative(s) | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/51] | Descourtieux, Philippe, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85400865.3 | 03.05.1985 | [1985/51] | Priority number, date | JP19840088331 | 04.05.1984 Original published format: JP 8833184 | [1985/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0165106 | Date: | 18.12.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0165106 | Date: | 15.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0165106 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11C11/407, G11C11/408, G11C11/409 | [1991/39] | CPC: |
G11C8/12 (EP,US);
H01L29/93 (KR);
G11C11/4076 (EP,US);
G11C11/408 (EP,US);
G11C11/4096 (EP,US);
G11C11/4097 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/51] | G11C11/24, G11C11/40, G11C8/00, G11C7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/51] | Title | German: | Halbleiterspeichergerät | [1985/51] | English: | Semiconductor memory device | [1985/51] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire semi-conductrice | [1985/51] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0087754 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [AD]US4122546 (VON BASSE PAUL-WERNER, et al) |