EP0166640 - Progressive clutch friction plate with a simplified construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1989 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states VALEO 64 Avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graton, Michel 7, boulevard Mortier F-75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
Carmillet, Roger 74, rue Championnet F-75018 Paris / FR | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 12, Avenue de la Grande-Armée 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | CABINET BONNET-THIRION 95 Boulevard Beaumarchais F-75003 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401052.7 | 29.05.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | FR19840008526 | 30.05.1984 Original published format: FR 8408526 | [1986/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0166640 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166640 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/64 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
F16D13/64 (EP,US);
F16D2013/642 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/01] | Title | German: | Auf vereinfachte Bauweise hergestellte Kupplungsscheibe für eine progressiv einschaltbare Kupplung | [1986/01] | English: | Progressive clutch friction plate with a simplified construction | [1986/01] | French: | Disque de friction d'embrayage de type progressif à construction simplifiée | [1986/01] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/29] | 23.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR866176 (BORG WARNER); | [A]US2256698 (WOLFRAM WILLIAM S); | [A]US2256709 (GEYER HARVEY D); | [A]FR2453318 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD [GB]) |