EP0167440 - Protective triac without gate realized with the aid of a high-resistance substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON SEMICONDUCTEURS 101, bld Murat 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states THOMSON SEMICONDUCTEURS 101, bld Murat F-75016 - Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states LE SILICIUM SEMICONDUCTEUR SSC 101, Boulevard Murat F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noguier, Jean-Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI-173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Montaut, Jean-Paul THOMSON-CSF SCPI-173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Guérin, Michel, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | Guérin, Michel, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401223.4 | 19.06.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | FR19840010348 | 29.06.1984 Original published format: FR 8410348 | [1986/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0167440 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167440 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/747, H01L29/10 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
H01L29/87 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/02] | Title | German: | Schutz-Triac ohne Gate, ausgeführt mit Hilfe eines Substrates mit hohem Widerstand | [1986/02] | English: | Protective triac without gate realized with the aid of a high-resistance substrate | [1986/02] | French: | Triac de protection sans gachette, réalisé à partir d'un substrat à haute résistivité | [1986/02] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 14.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0110777 ; | [Y]US4275408 ; | [A]EP0080044 ; | [A]US3896477 |