EP0173608 - Nematic liquid-crystal cell weakly doped by a chiral solution, it being of the electrically-controlled birefringence type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
Former [1986/10] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clerc, Jean-Frédéric 10, Allée du Pré Blanc F-38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
Rabas, Laurence 270, Avenue A. Croizat F-38400 Saint Martin D'Heres / FR | [1986/10] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1986/10] | Application number, filing date | 85401520.3 | 23.07.1985 | [1986/10] | Priority number, date | FR19840011896 | 26.07.1984 Original published format: FR 8411896 | [1986/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173608 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173608 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/137 | [1986/10] | CPC: |
G02F1/1393 (EP,US);
C09K19/02 (EP,US);
C09K19/586 (EP,US);
G02F1/13712 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/10] | Title | German: | Mit einem chiralen und vom doppelbrechenden Typ gelösten Stoff, schwach gedopte, elektrisch steuerbare, nematische Flüssigkristallzelle | [1986/10] | English: | Nematic liquid-crystal cell weakly doped by a chiral solution, it being of the electrically-controlled birefringence type | [1986/10] | French: | Cellule à cristal liquide nématique faiblement dopé par un soluté chiral, et du type à biréfringence contrôlée électriquement | [1986/10] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/41] | 20.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2033602 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US4019807 (BOSWELL DONALD D, et al) | [A] - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 53, no. 12, décembre 1982, pages 8599-8606, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; W.R. HEFFNER et al.: "Switching characteristics of a bistable cholesteric twist cell" | Examination | - International Handbook of Liquid Cristals Displays, 1975-76, Pages 22-24, Fig. F5-7 and F5-8; |