EP0172108 - Access neutralization device to protect an integrated-circuit zone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.1990 [1990/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 101 Boulevard Murat 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/14] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 101 Boulevard Murat F-75016 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states EUROTECHNIQUE ZI de Peynier-Rousset F-13 790 - Rousset / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silvestre de Ferron, Gérard THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Gaultier, Jean-Marie THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot 9, rue Claude Chappé Technopôle Metz 2000 57070 Metz / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1986/08] | Guérin, Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401606.0 | 06.08.1985 | [1986/08] | Priority number, date | FR19840012679 | 10.08.1984 Original published format: FR 8412679 | [1986/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172108 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172108 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/56, G06K19/06 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
G06K19/07372 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,US);
H01L23/585 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S257/922 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/08] | Title | German: | Zugangsneutralisierungsanordnung zum Schützen einer integrierten Schaltungszone | [1986/08] | English: | Access neutralization device to protect an integrated-circuit zone | [1986/08] | French: | Dispositif de neutralisation de l'accès à une zone à protéger d'un circuit intégré | [1986/08] | Examination procedure | 03.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 19.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4105156 (DETHLOFF JURGEN); | [A]EP0025347 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2471051 (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2503424 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |