EP0177383 - Broadband omnidirectional elastic wave transducer and method of manufacturing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | For all designated states Klein, Siegfried, Dr. 42, rue de la Tour d'Auvergne F-75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states Klein, Siegfried, Dr. 42, rue de la Tour d'Auvergne F-75009 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Klein, Siegfried, Dr. 42, rue de la Tour d'Auvergne F-75009 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Siegfried 42, rue de la Tour d'Auvergne F-75009 Paris / FR | [1986/15] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 85401673.0 | 22.08.1985 | [1986/15] | Priority number, date | FR19840013296 | 28.08.1984 Original published format: FR 8413296 | FR19840017282 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417282 | FR19840017283 | 13.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8417283 | [1986/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177383 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177383 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01H11/04, H04R15/00 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
G01H11/04 (EP,US);
H04R15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/15] | Title | German: | Allseitiger Breitbandwandler elastischer Wellen und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1986/15] | English: | Broadband omnidirectional elastic wave transducer and method of manufacturing it | [1986/15] | French: | Transducteur omnidirectionnel d'ondes élastiques à large bande passante et procédé de fabrication | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 21.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2670446 (TURNER EDWIN E); | [Y]GB402831 (MARCONI INTERNAT MARINE COMM C, et al); | [A]EP0063094 (KLEIN SIEGFRIED); | [A]EP0075911 (KLEIN SIEGFRIED [DE]); | [A]US3881165 (PARKER DAVID E, et al) | [Y] - ENGINEERING, vol. 207, 17 janvier 1969, pages 117-120, Londres, GB; B.K. GAZEY: "Underwater electroacoustic transducers" |