EP0184472 - Device for the fixation of a partial denture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/24] | Method and device for the fixation of a partial denture | ||
[1989/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.05.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Segura, Claude 20 rue Claude Bernard F-66000 Perpignan / FR | [1986/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Pinguet, André Cabinet de Proprieté Industrielle CAPRI, 94, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85401883.5 | 26.09.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | FR19840015378 | 08.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8415378 | [1986/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184472 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184472 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/225 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
A61C13/2653 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Teilprothese | [1989/28] | English: | Device for the fixation of a partial denture | [1989/28] | French: | Dispositif de pose de prothèse dentaire adjointe | [1989/28] |
Former [1986/24] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Teilprothese | ||
Former [1986/24] | Method and device for the fixation of a partial denture | ||
Former [1986/24] | Procédé et dispositif de pose de prothèse dentaire adjointe | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/08] | 23.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.01.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2085303 (BOSSOLA ETTORE); | [Y]US4386908 (KURZ CRAVEN H [US]); | [A]GB2117643 (HADER HELMUT); | [A]US4362509 (SULC JOSEF M); | [A]US4172323 (ORLOWSKI JAN A [US]); | [A]EP0069167 (MAISON TRE D DENTAL DINAMIC DI [IT]) |