EP0179720 - Process and device for measuring the thickness of thin metallic coatings deposited on a conductive support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEIN HEURTEY Z.A.I. du Bois de l'Epine BP No 69 F-91130 Ris Orangis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states STEIN HEURTEY Z.A.I. du Bois de l'Epine BP No 69 F-91130 Ris Orangis / FR | ||
Former [1986/18] | For all designated states STEIN HEURTEY Société dite: Z.A.I. du Bois de l'Epine F-91130 Ris Orangis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Robert 33 Avenue Eric Morlet F-91320 Wissous / FR | 02 /
Clergeot, Henri 4 Allée de Québec F-91300 Massy / FR | 03 /
Monteil, François 20 rue Louis Blériot F-91000 Bondoufle / FR | 04 /
Placko, Dominique 21 Allée de la Toison d'Or F-94000 Creteil / FR | [1989/40] |
Former [1986/36] | 01 /
Wang, Robert 33 Avenue Eric Morlet F-91320 Wissous / FR | ||
02 /
Clergeot, Henri 4 Allée de Québec F-91300 Massy / FR | |||
03 /
Monteil, François 20 rue Louis Blériot F-91000 Bondoufle / FR | |||
04 /
Placko, Dominique 21 Allée de la Toison d'Or | |||
Former [1986/18] | 01 /
Wang, Robert 33 Avenue Eric Morlet F-91320 Wissous / FR | Representative(s) | Armengaud Ainé, Alain Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/18] | Armengaud Ainé, Alain Cabinet ARMENGAUD AINE 3 Avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402064.1 | 23.10.1985 | [1986/18] | Priority number, date | FR19840016290 | 24.10.1984 Original published format: FR 8416290 | [1986/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179720 | Date: | 30.04.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179720 | Date: | 04.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01B7/10, G01B7/02 | [1986/18] | CPC: |
G01B7/105 (EP,US);
G01B5/00 (KR);
G01B7/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Dickenmessung von dünnen, auf einen leitenden Träger aufgebrachten, metallischen Schichten | [1986/18] | English: | Process and device for measuring the thickness of thin metallic coatings deposited on a conductive support | [1986/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour mesurer l'épaisseur de couches métalliques minces déposées sur un support conducteur | [1986/18] | Examination procedure | 15.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/46] | 23.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3358225 (PEUGEOT RICHARD S); | [X]US3626344 (SHATERNIKOV VIKTOR EGOROVICH, et al); | [X]FR2140864 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [Y]FR2534015 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]); | [AP]EP0129282 (CISE SPA [IT], et al); | [YPD]EP0136238 | Examination | FR2507310 |