EP0187072 - Rear suspension of an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/28] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veneau, Jean 21, Domaine de la Côte Noire F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [1986/28] | Representative(s) | Saint Martin, René, et al Régie Nationale des Usines Renault Direction des Recherches et Développements Service 0804 8-10, Avenue Emile-Zola 92109 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Saint Martin, René, et al Régie Nationale des Usines Renault Direction des Recherches et Développements Service 0804 8-10, Avenue Emile-Zola F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1986/28] | Réal, Jacques Régie Nationale des Usines Renault SCE 0804 F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402329.8 | 27.11.1985 | [1986/28] | Priority number, date | FR19840018253 | 30.11.1984 Original published format: FR 8418253 | [1986/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0187072 | Date: | 09.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0187072 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B60G3/20 | [1986/28] | CPC: |
B60G3/22 (EP);
B60G3/28 (EP);
B60G2200/466 (EP);
B60G2204/422 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/28] | Title | German: | Hinterradaufhängung eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [1986/28] | English: | Rear suspension of an automotive vehicle | [1986/28] | French: | Train arrière de véhicule automobile | [1986/28] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 29.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP6092106 ; | [A]US3573882 (WINSEN FRIEDRICH H VAN); | [A]DE2828758 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [A]DE2924368 (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | [A]GB2087322 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG); | [E]FR2565530 (RENAULT [FR]) | [XP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 238 (M-416) [1961], 25th septembre 1985; & JP - A - 60 92 106 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO K.K.) 23-05-1985, & JP6092106 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0095780 |