EP0184962 - Retention housing for a turbo fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1989 [1989/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2 Boulevard Victor F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lardellier, Alain Marie Joseph 1, rue Augereau F-77000 Melun / FR | [1986/25] | Representative(s) | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 91003 Evry Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/25] | Moinat, François S.N.E.C.M.A. Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 81 F-91003 Evry Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402398.3 | 04.12.1985 | [1986/25] | Priority number, date | FR19840018593 | 06.12.1984 Original published format: FR 8418593 | [1986/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0184962 | Date: | 18.06.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0184962 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/04 | [1986/25] | CPC: |
F01D21/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/25] | Title | German: | Gehäuseschutzring für ein Gasturbinengebläse | [1986/25] | English: | Retention housing for a turbo fan | [1986/25] | French: | Carter de rétention pour soufflante de turboréacteur | [1986/25] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/25] | 26.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2114233 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [A]CH460450 (UNITED AIRCRAFT CORP [US]); | [A]GB2112349 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [AD]EP0028183 (SNECMA [FR]); | [A]EP0030179 (SNECMA [FR]) |