EP0188969 - Process and composition for preventing the agglomeration of non-powdery salts and fertilizers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE FRANCAISE DE PRODUITS INDUSTRIELS 28, Boulevard Camélinat F-92233 Gennevilliers / FR | [1986/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schapira, Joseph 32, rue Miollis F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Ruel, Jacques 6, rue du Général Leclerc F-95210 Saint-Gratien / FR | 03 /
Cheminaud, Jean-Claude 10, rue Henri Dunand F-95220 Herblay / FR | 04 /
Petitbon, Pascal 13, rue Louis Castel F-92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 85402622.6 | 24.12.1985 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | FR19840019789 | 24.12.1984 Original published format: FR 8419789 | [1986/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0188969 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0188969 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/30, C05C1/02, C05G3/00 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
B01J2/30 (EP);
C05G5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Produkt für das Nichtzusammenbacken von nichtpulverigen Salzen und Düngern | [1986/31] | English: | Process and composition for preventing the agglomeration of non-powdery salts and fertilizers | [1986/31] | French: | Procédé et composition pour l'antimottage des sels ou des engrais non pulvérulents | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 25.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.12.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB705270 (BERGWERKSGESELLSCHAFT HIBERNIA); | [A]FR2155883 (PIERREFITTE AUBY SA) | Examination | US3190774 |