EP0214352 - Adaptive packet/circuit switched transportation method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | For:FR
Compagnie IBM FRANCE 5 Place Vendôme F-75000 Paris 1er / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For:BE
CH
DE
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | ||
For:FR
Compagnie IBM FRANCE 5 Place Vendôme F-75000 Paris 1er / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calvignac, Jean 187 Chemin Les Vallières F-06610 La Gaude / FR | 02 /
Secondo, Pierre Rue de la Ferrage F-06640 Saint Jeannet / FR | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle 06610 La Gaude / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | Lattard, Nicole Compagnie IBM France Département de Propriété Intellectuelle F-06610 La Gaude / FR | Application number, filing date | 85430027.4 | 13.08.1985 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214352 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214352 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/54, H04J3/16 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
H04J3/1629 (EP,US);
H04L12/64 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/12] | H04L11/20, H04J3/16 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | Adaptives paket-/durchschaltvermitteltes Transportsystem und Verfahren | [1987/12] | English: | Adaptive packet/circuit switched transportation method and system | [1987/12] | French: | Méthode et système de transport adaptatif pour la commutation circuit/paquet | [1987/12] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 23.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.10.1990 | [1991/44] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1982 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON SUBSCRIBER LOOPS AND SERVICES, 20th-24th September 1982, Toronto, CA, pages 35-39, T.M.C.N. TOWER LTD., New York, US; R. RENOULIN: "An integrated service local network for distributed access of heterogeneous terminals made for firm management the project carthage" | [A] - THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATION, 12th-14th August 1974, Stockholm, SE, pages 507-515, K. KUMMERLE, SE; "Multiplexor performance for integrated line and packet-switched traffic" |