EP0164298 - 6-Alpha-methyl-D-homo-corticoids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/50] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Annen, Klaus, Dr. Osthofstrasse 80 D-4400 Münster-Albachten / DE | 02 /
Laurent, Henry, Dr. Glambecker Weg 21 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 03 /
Hofmeister, Helmut, Dr. Weislingenstrasse 4 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 04 /
Wiechert, Rudolf, Prof. Dr. Petzower Strasse 8A D-1000 Berlin 39 / DE | [1985/50] | Application number, filing date | 85730038.8 | 08.03.1985 | [1985/50] | Priority number, date | DE19843409554 | 13.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3409554 | [1985/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0164298 | Date: | 11.12.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0164298 | Date: | 03.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07J63/00, A61K31/57, C07J71/00 | [1985/50] | CPC: |
C07J63/008 (EP);
A61P5/12 (EP);
C07J71/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/50] | Title | German: | Neue 6alpha-Methyl-D-homo-kortikoide | [1985/50] | English: | 6-Alpha-methyl-D-homo-corticoids | [1985/50] | French: | 6-Alpha-méthyl-D-homo-corticoides | [1985/50] | File destroyed: | 17.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1985 | Examination requested [1985/50] | 06.02.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2182911 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | FR2244474 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | FR2387997 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) |