EP0204878 - Cross-rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 40027 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/51] | For all designated states MANNESMANN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 36 41 D-40027 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nickel, Wilhelm, Dip.-Ing. Eibenkamp 8 D-4330 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | 02 /
Schirmag, Klaus-P., Dipl.-Ing. Dachsweg 2 D-4030 Ratingen 4 / DE | 03 /
Mailänder, Engelbert Mangelhauser Strasse 26 D-6601 Heusweiler 1 / DE | [1986/51] | Representative(s) | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Meissner, Peter E., et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1986/51] | Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 85730071.9 | 17.05.1985 | [1986/51] | Priority number, date | EP19850730025 | 18.02.1985 Original published format: EP 85730025 | [1986/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0204878 | Date: | 17.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0204878 | Date: | 05.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204878 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B21B19/02 | [1986/51] | CPC: |
B21B19/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU [1986/51] | Title | German: | Schrägwalzwerk | [1986/51] | English: | Cross-rolling mill | [1986/51] | French: | Laminoir en croix | [1986/51] | Examination procedure | 10.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/33] | 19.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.1990 | GB | 17.05.1990 | BE | 31.05.1990 | LU | 31.05.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/49] | AT | 17.05.1990 | |
GB | 17.05.1990 | ||
BE | 31.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/34] | GB | 17.05.1990 | |
BE | 31.05.1990 | ||
Former [1991/30] | GB | 17.05.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE846384 ; | [Y]DE2827727 ; | [Y]DE8244 ; | [A]DE1527750 ; | [A]DE2219941 | [A] - BLECH ROHRE PROFILE, 23. Jahrgang, 7. August 1976, Seiten 187-190, Coburg; W. NEUMANN et al.: "Moderne Walzwerksanlagen zur Herstellung von dickwandigen Rohren mit engen Wanddickentoleranzen" |