EP0225418 - Vibrating grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/25] | Vibrating polishing machine | ||
[1989/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYSERVICE AG Lengnaustrasse 6 2543 Lengnau / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states POLYSERVICE AG Lengnaustrasse 6 CH-2543 Lengnau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacot, Simon Jurastrasse 11 CH-2543 Lengnau / CH | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Seehof, Michel, et al Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Seehof, Michel, et al Ammann Patentanwälte AG Bern Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [1987/25] | Seehof, Michel, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 CH-3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 85810590.1 | 12.12.1985 | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0225418 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225418 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B24B31/073 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
B24B31/073 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/36] |
Former [1987/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Vibrationsgleitschleifmaschine | [1987/25] | English: | Vibrating grinding machine | [1989/03] | French: | Machine à poncer vibrante | [1989/03] |
Former [1987/25] | Vibrating polishing machine | ||
Former [1987/25] | Machine de polissage vibrante | Examination procedure | 08.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 12.02.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, LU, NL, SE | 22.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.12.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 12.12.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 12.12.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 12.12.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3042322 (SYMONS LOREN G); | [A]CH446100 (SCHMID AUGUST [CH]) |