EP0192916 - Thread reel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MÖLNLYCKE SYTRAD AKTIEBOLAG Karl Johansg. 152 Box 12093 S-402 41 Göteborg / SE | [1988/38] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states Olofsson, Stig Ernst Erik Angantyrvägen 36 S-182 64 Djursholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olofsson, Stig Ernst Erik Angantyrvägen 36 S-182 64 Djursholm / SE | [1988/38] |
Former [1986/36] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wallin, Bo-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | Wallin, Bo-Göran, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [1986/36] | Nordén, Ake Oscar Grahn Patentbyra AB Box 19540 S-104 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 85850064.8 | 27.02.1985 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0192916 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192916 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/28, B65H75/14 | [1986/36] | CPC: |
B65H75/14 (EP,US);
B65H75/28 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US);
B65H2701/5122 (EP,US);
B65H2701/5136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/36] | Title | German: | Fadenspule | [1986/36] | English: | Thread reel | [1986/36] | French: | Bobine pour fils | [1986/36] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/14] | 11.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1137111 (THIRIEZ PERE & FILS & CARTIER); | [A]GB1247970 (GUTERMANN & CO AG [CH]); | [A]DE2644882 (AMANN & SOEHNE); | [A]DE2647544 (ACKERMANN GOEGGINGEN AG); | [A]FR2373479 (HACOBA TEXTILMASCHINEN [DE]); | [A]US4184653 (BONZO ROY T [US]); | [A]EP0073605 (GUTERMANN & CO AG [CH]) |