EP0156782 - A double pump adapted for use as an artificial heart [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Humanteknik AB Arstaängsvägen 1A 117 43 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states Humanteknik AB Arstaängsvägen 1A S-117 43 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states Astra-Tech Aktiebolag Arstaängsvägen 1A S-117 43 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lundbäck, Stig Östra Tynningö S-185 00 Vaxholm / SE | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Nyberg, Bengt CARMINGER, UUSITALO & NYBERG Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 7274 103 89 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Nyberg, Bengt CARMINGER, UUSITALO & NYBERG Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 7274 S-103 89 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1985/40] | Hjertman, Ivan T. AB ASTRA Patent and Trade Mark Department S-151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 85850102.6 | 22.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | SE19840001779 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: SE 8401779 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156782 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156782 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156782 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/12 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
A61M60/894 (EP,US);
A61M60/422 (KR);
A61M60/196 (KR);
A61M60/427 (EP,US);
A61M60/869 (KR);
A61M60/873 (EP,US);
A61M60/876 (EP,US);
A61M60/882 (EP,US);
F04B43/10 (KR);
A61M60/148 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Doppelpumpe zur Verwendung in einem künstlichen Herzen | [1985/40] | English: | A double pump adapted for use as an artificial heart | [1985/40] | French: | Pompe double conçue pour un coeur artificiel | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 18.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 27.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.10.1992 | BE | 07.10.1992 | CH | 07.10.1992 | LI | 07.10.1992 | NL | 07.10.1992 | LU | 31.03.1993 | [1999/52] |
Former [1994/18] | AT | 07.10.1992 | |
BE | 07.10.1992 | ||
CH | 07.10.1992 | ||
LI | 07.10.1992 | ||
NL | 07.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | BE | 07.10.1992 | |
CH | 07.10.1992 | ||
LI | 07.10.1992 | ||
NL | 07.10.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | CH | 07.10.1992 | |
LI | 07.10.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1037523 |