EP0178273 - Single-sided cutting insert [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Santrade Ltd. Alpenquai 12 P.O. Box 321 CH-6002 Luzern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states Santrade Ltd. Alpenquai 12 P.O. Box 321 CH-6002 Luzern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carlsson, Stiv Svanbygatan 40 S-815 00 Tierp / SE | 02 /
Gustafsson, Lars-Erik Linggatan 13 S-811 32 Sandviken / SE | 03 /
Robertsson, Tage Falkvägen 7 S-740 52 Gimo / SE | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al AB Sandvik Central Service Patents & Licences 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | Taquist, Lennart, et al AB Sandvik Central Service Patents & Licences S-811 81 Sandviken / SE | Application number, filing date | 85850300.6 | 30.09.1985 | [1989/42] | Priority number, date | SE19840005059 | 10.10.1984 Original published format: SE 8405059 | [1986/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0178273 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0178273 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0178273 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0178273 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B23B27/14, B23B27/06 | [1986/16] | CPC: |
B23B27/065 (EP,US);
B23B27/141 (EP,US);
Y10T407/235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/16] | Title | German: | Einseitig brauchbarer Schneideinsatz | [1986/16] | English: | Single-sided cutting insert | [1986/16] | French: | Plaquette de coupe utilisable d'un côté | [1986/16] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 16.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.1990
02.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE KRUPP WIDIA GMBH Münchner Str. 90 45145 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Vomberg, Friedhelm Patentanwalt Schulstrasse 8 42653 Solingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.04.1990
02.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE KRUPP WIDIA GMBH Münchner Str. 90 D-45145 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Vomberg, Friedhelm, Dipl.-Phys. Schulstrasse 8 D-42653 Solingen / DE | 04.07.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.10.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.11.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 17.01.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.07.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 18.10.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.11.1991 | Appeal received No. T0873/91 | 16.01.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.09.1994 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1994/40] | 08.12.1994 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/50] | 02.05.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0119175 (SANTRADE LTD [CH]); | [A]EP0081775 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]FR2160197 (FAGERSTA AB); | [A]US4281430 (HELLNICK DIETER H); | [A]GB2030899 (IGMAN SA) |