EP0153290 - Process and apparatus for separating a fluidum mixture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. SOCIETE DE RECHERCHES ET DE DEVELOPPEMENT INDUSTRIEL (SO RE DI) Chemin des Crolis, 4 B-1473 Glabais / BE | [1985/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willot, Henri Chemin des Crolis, 4 B-1473 Glabais / BE | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Fobe, Edouard, et al Bureau Vander Haeghen S.A. Rue Colonel Bourg 108 A B-1040 Bruxelles / BE | [1988/44] |
Former [1985/35] | De Brabanter, Maurice Bureau VANDER HAEGHEN 63 Avenue de la Toison d'Or B-1060 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 85870010.7 | 22.01.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | BE19840212270 | 24.01.1984 Original published format: BE 212270 | [1985/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0153290 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D59/18, B01D53/00, B01J19/10 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/00 (EP);
B01D59/18 (EP);
B01J19/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Trennung einer Fluidummischung | [1985/35] | English: | Process and apparatus for separating a fluidum mixture | [1985/35] | French: | Procédé et appareillage pour séparer un mélange de fluides | [1985/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 21.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/12] | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   06.07.1987 | 01.02.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.1988 | 31.01.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1989 | 31.01.1990 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2301467 (MOBIL OIL CORP); | [A]FR1230416 ; | [A]GB1283587 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |