EP0158620 - Rotating vacuum filters with horizontal filtrating surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.1986 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prayon Développement Société anonyme rue Joseph Wauters, 144 4130 Engis / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states Prayon Développement Société anonyme rue Joseph Wauters, 144 B-4130 Engis / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davister, Armand Laurent Quai de la Boverie 98/091 B-4200 Liège / GB | 02 /
Martin, Georges-François Chaussée de Ramioul 325 B-4120 Flémalle / BE | [1985/42] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel p.a. FREYLINGER & ASSOCIES 85/042 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | van Malderen, Michel p.a. FREYLINGER & ASSOCIES 85/042 Boulevard de la Sauvenière B-4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 85870032.1 | 28.02.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | LU19840085251 | 14.03.1984 Original published format: LU 85251 | [1985/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158620 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D33/24, B01D35/08, B01D33/40 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
B01D36/001 (EP,US);
B01D33/19 (EP,US);
B01D33/60 (EP,US);
B01D33/804 (EP,US);
B01D33/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | IT [1985/42] | Title | German: | Vakuumdrehfilter mit horizontaler Filtrationsoberfläche | [1985/42] | English: | Rotating vacuum filters with horizontal filtrating surfaces | [1985/42] | French: | Perfectionnement apporté aux filtres rotatifs sous vide à plan de filtration horizontal | [1985/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1987/20: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 85900962.3/0175702 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 24.03.87 | EPB 1987/20: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 85900962.3/0175702 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 24.03.87 | EPB 1987/20: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 85900962.3/0175702 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 24.03.87 | Examination procedure | 20.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2334401 (PRAYON [BE]); | [A]US3361262 (ORR DUNDAS S, et al) |