EP0181852 - Substituted 2,6-substituted pyridine compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | For all designated states Monsanto Company 800 North Lindbergh Boulevard St. Louis Missouri 63167-7020 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Len Fang 2561 Trenton Station St. Charles Missouri 63301 / US | 02 /
Miller, Maria Ludovina 833 Killiney Drive Manchester Missouri 63011 / US | [1986/21] | Representative(s) | Lunt, John Cooper R. 102(1), et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/21] | Lunt, John Cooper, et al Monsanto Europe S.A. Patent Department Avenue de Tervuren 270-272 Letter Box No 1 B-1150 Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 85870152.7 | 05.11.1985 | [1986/21] | Priority number, date | US19840668928 | 06.11.1984 Original published format: US 668928 | US19850768660 | 27.08.1985 Original published format: US 768660 | [1986/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0181852 | Date: | 21.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0181852 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/80, C07F9/58, A01N43/40 | [1986/21] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP,US);
C07D213/02 (KR);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N47/18 (EP,US);
A01N47/20 (EP,US);
A01N57/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/21] | Title | German: | 2,6-Substituierte Pyridinverbindungen mit weiteren Substituenten | [1986/21] | English: | Substituted 2,6-substituted pyridine compounds | [1986/21] | French: | Composés pyridiques 2,6-substitués ayant des substituants additionnels | [1986/21] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 21.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3637716 [ ] (BIMBER RUSSELL M, et al); | US3651070 [ ] (GRANITO CHARLES E); | US3748334 [ ] (RIGTERINK R); | GB1489906 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | EP0044262 [ ] (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) |