EP0155929 - Self-propelled soil compacting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.1989 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.12.1989 [1989/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOEST-ALPINE Aktiengesellschaft Friedrichstrasse 4 A-1011 Wien / AT | [1985/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirn, Ferdinand Ennstal Nr. 60 A-8943 Aigen / AT | 02 /
Schmölzer, Michael Ausseerstrasse 39 A-8940 Liezen / AT | [1985/39] | Representative(s) | Kretschmer, Adolf, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. A. Kretschmer Dr. Thomas M. Haffner Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/39] | Kretschmer, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. A. Kretschmer Dr. Thomas M. Haffner Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 85890061.6 | 14.03.1985 | [1985/39] | Priority number, date | AT19840000994 | 23.03.1984 Original published format: AT 99484 | [1985/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0155929 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0155929 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0155929 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E02D3/026 | [1985/39] | CPC: |
E02D3/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/39] | Title | German: | Fahrbares Bodenverdichtungsgerät | [1985/39] | English: | Self-propelled soil compacting apparatus | [1985/39] | French: | Appareil compacteur de sol automobile | [1989/01] |
Former [1985/39] | Appareil compacteur du sol automobile | Examination procedure | 19.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 09.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2386025 ; | [Y]US2164845 ; | [A]DE1257187 ; | [A]FR2133536 |