EP0167517 - Galvanic element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/02] | Galvanic coil | ||
[1989/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1990 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.E.A. Studiengesellschaft für Energiespeicher und Antriebssysteme Gesellschaft m.b.H. Bleckmanngasse 10 Postfach 49 A-8680 Mürzzuschlag / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/47] | For all designated states S.E.A. Studiengesellschaft für Energiespeicher und Antriebssysteme Gesellschaft m.b.H. Bleckmanngasse 10 Postfach 49 A-8680 Mürzzuschlag / AT | ||
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states VEREINIGTE EDELSTAHLWERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomazic, Gerd, Dr. Hofkirchergasse 4 A-8680 Mürzzuschlag / AT | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1986/47] |
Former [1986/02] | Widtmann, Georg, Dr. Vereinigte Edelstahlwerke Aktiengesellschaft (VEW) Elisabethstrasse 12 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 85890124.2 | 04.06.1985 | [1986/02] | Priority number, date | AT19840001858 | 06.06.1984 Original published format: AT 185884 | [1986/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0167517 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0167517 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/36, H01M2/40 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
H01M10/365 (EP);
H01M50/77 (EP,US);
H01M12/08 (EP);
H01M50/70 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/02] | Title | German: | Galvanisches Element | [1986/02] | English: | Galvanic element | [1989/17] | French: | Elément galvanique | [1986/02] |
Former [1986/02] | Galvanic coil | Examination procedure | 11.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 24.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 24.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.06.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | AT363534B [ ] (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]); | EP0091520 [ ] (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD [JP]) |