EP0171383 - Incremental measuring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 31.01.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1991 | Opposition rejected | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RSF-Elektronik Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-5121 Tarsdorf 93 / AT | [1990/20] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states RSF-Elektronik Gesellschaft m.b.H. A-5121 Tarsdorf 93 / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rieder, Heinz Riedersbach 90 A-5120 St. Pantaleon / AT | 02 /
Schwaiger, Max A-5121 Ostermiething Nr. 298 / AT | [1989/03] |
Former [1986/07] | 01 /
Rieder, Heinz Ridersbach 90 A-5120 St. Pantaleon / AT | ||
02 /
Schwaiger, Max A-5121 Ostermiething Nr. 298 / AT | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Gerhard, et al Patentanwälte Hübscher & Hübscher Postfach 380 Spittelwiese 7 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | Hübscher, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 85890140.8 | 25.06.1985 | [1986/07] | Priority number, date | AT19840002175 | 06.07.1984 Original published format: AT 217584 | [1986/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171383 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0171383 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245, G01B7/02 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
G01B7/02 (EP,US);
G01D5/2451 (EP,US);
G01D5/2457 (EP,US);
G05B19/231 (EP,US);
H02J7/00047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/07] | Title | German: | Inkrementales Messsystem | [1986/07] | English: | Incremental measuring system | [1986/07] | French: | Système de mesure incrémentiel | [1986/07] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/39] | 05.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.10.1989
15.01.1990
ADMISSIBLE DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GmbH Dr.-Johannes-Heidenhain-Str. 5 D-83301 Traunreut / DE | [1989/49] | 17.01.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.05.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.06.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 26.07.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 24.10.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 06.11.1990 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2730715 (RIEDER); | [Y]US4128481 (SCHREYER HEINZ B); | [A]GB2001786 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH); | [AD]GB2065872 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES); | [Y]EP0085787 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]); | [AP]EP0118673 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) |