EP0166784 - AREA MACHINING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.1990 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | ||
Former [1986/02] | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHI, Hajimu Hino Hirayamadai Jutaku 1104 6-7-8-, Asahigaoka Hino-shi Tokyo 168 / JP | 02 /
SEKI, Masaki 3-15-2-406, Takaido-nishi Suginami-ku Tokyo 168 / JP | 03 /
TAKEGAHARA, Takashi Janbohru Hachioji 604 4-1-9, Myoujin-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | [1986/02] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/02] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85900185.1 | 14.12.1984 | [1986/02] | WO1984JP00591 | Priority number, date | JP19830235460 | 14.12.1983 Original published format: JP 23546083 | [1986/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8502571 | Date: | 20.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0166784 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.06.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q15/00, B23Q33/00, B23H7/28, B23C3/00 | [1986/02] | CPC: |
G05B19/41 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49381 (EP,US);
G05B2219/49392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN VON OBERFLÄCHEN | [1986/02] | English: | AREA MACHINING METHOD | [1986/02] | French: | PROCEDE D'USINAGE DE SURFACES | [1986/02] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.1985 | Translation filed | 27.08.1985 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.1985 | Search fee paid | 27.08.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1986/02] | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/43] | 28.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0088449 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [Y]EP0075025 (FANUC LTD [JP]) | International search | [A]JPS5754050 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JPS5343183 (OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD) |