EP0171399 - FIRMELY INSULATED BASE FOR CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INNOPLAN AG Höhenweg 22 CH-8832 Wollerau / CH | [1986/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUTER, Anton Höhenweg 22 CH-8832 Wollerau / CH | [1986/08] | Representative(s) | Haffter, Tobias Fred, et al PATENTANWALTS-BUREAU ISLER AG Postfach 6940 Walchestrasse 23 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Haffter, Tobias Fred, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al PATENTANWALTS-BUREAU ISLER AG Postfach 6940 Walchestrasse 23 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85900616.5 | 01.02.1985 | [1986/08] | WO1985CH00016 | Priority number, date | CH19840000590 | 08.02.1984 Original published format: CH 59084 | [1986/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503422 | Date: | 15.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0171399 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A47G23/03 | [1986/08] | CPC: |
A47G23/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/08] | Title | German: | WÄRMEDÄMMENDER UNTERSATZ FÜR GEFÄSSE | [1986/08] | English: | FIRMELY INSULATED BASE FOR CONTAINERS | [1986/08] | French: | DESSOUS DE PLAT A ISOLATION THERMIQUE POUR RECIPIENTS | [1986/08] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1993 | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.1985 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 17.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/03] | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1987 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR870075 [ ]; | FR1010574 [ ]; | CH604643 [ ]; | US1447667 [ ]; | US4089498 [ ] |