EP0170689 - METHOD FOR STRIPPING NOXIOUS GAS SUBSTANCES CONTAINED IN FLUE GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.1986 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hugo Petersen Ges. für verfahrenstechn. Anlagenbau mbH & Co KG Dantestrasse 4-6 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/07] | For all designated states Hugo Petersen Ges. für verfahrenstechn. Anlagenbau mbH & Co KG Dantestrasse 4-6 D-6200 Wiesbaden 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEVE, Urban Längestenstr. 19 D-5273 Bergneustadt / DE | [1986/07] | Application number, filing date | 85901000.1 | 06.02.1985 | [1986/07] | WO1985EP00029 | Priority number, date | DE19843403995 | 06.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3403995 | [1986/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503455 | Date: | 15.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0170689 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/34 | [1986/07] | CPC: |
B01D53/34 (EP);
B01D53/508 (EP);
B01D53/8625 (EP);
F23J15/006 (EP);
F23J2215/20 (EP);
F23J2215/30 (EP);
F23J2219/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, FR, GB, SE [1986/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHEIDUNG VON IN RAUCHGAS ENTHALTENEN GASFÖRMIGEN SCHADSTOFFEN | [1986/07] | English: | METHOD FOR STRIPPING NOXIOUS GAS SUBSTANCES CONTAINED IN FLUE GAS | [1986/07] | French: | PROCEDE D'EXTRACTION DE SUBSTANCES NOCIVES GAZEUSES CONTENUES DANS DES GAZ DE FUMEES | [1986/07] | File destroyed: | 16.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 20.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/34] | 24.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1986/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.11.1985 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 07.11.1985 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 07.11.1985 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 07.11.1985 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.02.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE3308927 [ ] (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C [DE]); | DE3101053 [ ] (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH [DE]); | DE2539003 [ ] (HITACHI LTD) |