EP0172256 - SYSTEM FOR RETURNING TO ORIGIN FOR AN ARTICULATED ROBOT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Seiichiro 3-2, Hinohon-cho 5-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
TOYODA, Kenichi 17-25, Shinmei 1-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 03 /
TORII, Nobutoshi Fuyou-Haitsu 308 65-4, Takakura-cho Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192 / JP | 04 /
NIHEI, Ryo Mezonrira 202 34-7, Kichijojihon-cho 1-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180 / JP | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/09] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901063.9 | 20.02.1985 | [1986/09] | WO1985JP00068 | Priority number, date | JP19840000298 | 20.02.1984 Original published format: JP 29884 | [1986/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503663 | Date: | 29.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172256 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.08.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/10, B25J9/16, B25J13/00, G05B19/18 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
B25J9/046 (EP);
B25J9/1692 (EP);
G05B2219/45083 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/09] | Title | German: | RÜCKKEHRSYSTEM FÜR EINEN GEGLIEDERTEN ROBOTER | [1986/09] | English: | SYSTEM FOR RETURNING TO ORIGIN FOR AN ARTICULATED ROBOT | [1986/09] | French: | SYSTEME DE RETOUR A L'ORIGINE POUR UN ROBOT ARTICULE | [1986/09] | File destroyed: | 17.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.1985 | Translation filed | 01.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 01.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 01.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.11.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/09] | 20.12.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]WO8401740 ; | [Y]DE1302667 | International search | [Y]JPS5829578 ; | [Y]JPS50125186 ; | [Y]JPS55174609U |