EP0173753 - 6-SUBSTITUTED PROSTAGLANDIN E1'S AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Toshio 17-20, Tamadaira 6-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 02 /
HAZATO, Atsuo 11-16-102, Tamadaira 6-chome Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | 03 /
KUROZUMI, Seiji 2-28, Higashitokura 1-chome Kokubunji-shi Tokyo 185 / JP | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901083.7 | 28.02.1985 | [1986/11] | WO1985JP00096 | Priority number, date | JP19840036096 | 29.02.1984 Original published format: JP 3609684 | [1986/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503935 | Date: | 12.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0173753 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173753 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07C177/00, A61K31/557 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
C07C405/0041 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C405/00 (EP,US);
C07F1/02 (EP,US);
C07F1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1986/11] | Title | German: | 6-SUBSTITUIERTE PROSTAGLANDINE E 1 SOWIE DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1986/11] | English: | 6-SUBSTITUTED PROSTAGLANDIN E1'S AND PROCESS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [1986/11] | French: | PROSTAGLANDINES E 1 6-SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1989/42] |
Former [1986/11] | PROSTAGLANDINES E 1? 6-SUBSTITUEES ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.1985 | Translation filed | 04.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 04.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2108960 (UPJOHN CO) | International search | [A]JPS5444639 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO); | [A]JPS55141465 (HOECHST AG); | [A]JPS5936657 (TEIJIN LTD) |