EP0172239 - SOLID STATE KEY FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO COMPUTER SOFTWARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THUMBSCAN INC. Two Mid-America Plaza Suite 800 Oakbrook Terrace Illinois 60181 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states THUMBSCAN INC. Two Mid-America Plaza Suite 800 Oakbrook Terrace Illinois 60181 / US | ||
Former [1986/09] | For all designated states GORDIAN SYSTEMS, INC. 3512 West Bayshore Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARGILE, William, P. 2064 Touraine Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [1986/09] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [1986/14] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1986/09] | Armitage, Ian Michael MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901253.6 | 21.02.1985 | [1986/09] | WO1985US00275 | Priority number, date | US19840582302 | 22.02.1984 Original published format: US 582302 | [1986/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8503785 | Date: | 29.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0172239 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0172239 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.08.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1986/09] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06F21/34 (EP,US);
G07C9/00309 (EP,US);
G07C9/21 (EP,US);
G07C9/215 (EP,US);
G07C9/23 (EP,US);
G07F7/1025 (EP,US);
G06F2211/007 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00388 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00412 (EP,US);
G07C2009/005 (EP,US);
G07C2009/00769 (EP,US);
G07C9/0069 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/09] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERSCHLÜSSEL ZUR STEUERUNG DES ZUGANGS ZU RECHNERSOFTWARE | [1986/09] | English: | SOLID STATE KEY FOR CONTROLLING ACCESS TO COMPUTER SOFTWARE | [1986/09] | French: | CLEF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POUR CONTROLER L'ACCES AU LOGICIEL DE L'ORDINATEUR | [1986/09] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 11.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3959633 (LAWRENCE WILLIAM GROVE, et al); | [Y]GB2080203 (PITNEY BOWES INC) | [AP] - COMPUTER, vol. 17, no. 3, March 1984, page 99, Long Beach, Ca., US; "Security device eliminates passwords and encryption" | International search | [AP]US3891799 (MELHOSE ALFRED E); | [A]US4295039 (STUCKERT PAUL E); | [Y]US4310720 (CHECK JR FRANK T); | [A]US4430728 (BEITEL JAMES E [US], et al); | [YP]US4447890 (DUWEL EDWARD C [US], et al); | [AP]US4475175 (SMITH JAMES G [CA]); | [AP]US4484306 (KULCZYCKYJ ANTIN U [US], et al); | [AP]US4486828 (KITAMURA JUNJI [JP], et al); | [AP]US4494114 (KAISH NORMAN [US]) |