EP0174348 - MEASURING PROCESS AND INSTALLATION FOR DETERMINING THE THERMAL RESISTANCE OF BUILDING ELEMENTS, PARTICULARLY OUTER WALLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGANA AG Rotackerstrasse 21 CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH | [1986/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SZABO, Paul Sagenstrasse 12 CH-6030 Ebikon / CH | [1986/12] | Representative(s) | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro Petschner & Partner Rothusmatt 5 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/12] | Petschner, Goetz Patentanwaltsbüro G. Petschner Wannenstrasse 16 CH-8800 Thalwil / CH | Application number, filing date | 85901331.0 | 20.03.1985 | [1986/12] | WO1985CH00047 | Priority number, date | CH19840001475 | 23.03.1984 Original published format: CH 147584 | [1986/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504479 | Date: | 10.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0174348 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/18 | [1986/12] | CPC: |
G01N25/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL, SE [1986/12] | Title | German: | MESSVERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERMITTLUNG DES WÄRMEDURCHLASSWIDERSTANDES AN BAUKÖRPERN, INSBESONDERE AUSSENWÄNDEN | [1986/12] | English: | MEASURING PROCESS AND INSTALLATION FOR DETERMINING THE THERMAL RESISTANCE OF BUILDING ELEMENTS, PARTICULARLY OUTER WALLS | [1986/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE ET INSTALLATION POUR DETERMINER LA RESISTANCE THERMIQUE D'ELEMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION, EN PARTICULIER DE PAROIS EXTERIEURES | [1986/12] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 07.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/24] | 17.01.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0065433 [ ] (RECH BATIMENT TRAVAUX PUB [FR]); | DE2939053 [ ] (HANSAG HOLDING AG); | DE965447 [ ] (SIEGFRIED REINSDORF DIPL ING) | [A] - Review of Scientific Instruments, Vol. 53, No. 6, June 1982 (New York, USA), HOOSUNG LEE: "Rapid Measurement of Thermal Conductivity of Polymer Films", pages 884-887, see page 884 to page 886 |