EP0199731 - GEAR SHIFTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | For all designated states ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN Aktiengesellschaft D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHBERGER, Gottfried Ammernweg 3 D-7990 Friedrichshafen / DE | 02 /
ANGELE, Eugen Raderacher Strasse 15 D-7990 Friedrichshafen / DE | [1986/45] | Representative(s) | Raue, Reimund ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/45] | Raue, Reimund ZF FRIEDRICHSHAFEN AG D-88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85901409.4 | 26.02.1985 | [1986/45] | WO1985EP00069 | Priority number, date | WO1984EP00081 | 17.03.1984 Original published format: PCT/EP84/00081 | [1986/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504230 | Date: | 26.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0199731 | Date: | 05.11.1986 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0199731 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16H5/36, G05G9/18 | [1986/45] | CPC: |
F16H63/20 (EP,US);
F16H61/705 (EP,US);
F16H63/34 (EP,US);
F16H2061/242 (EP,US);
F16H61/18 (EP,US);
F16H61/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1986/45] | Title | German: | GETRIEBESCHALTEINRICHTUNG | [1986/45] | English: | GEAR SHIFTING DEVICE | [1986/45] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE | [1986/45] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1985 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 02.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/45] | 28.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE7532116U [ ]; | FR1568530 [ ]; | DE2813099 [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AG); | GB2041468 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | GB2089450 [ ] (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN); | GB2127503 [ ] (DAIMLER BENZ AG) |