EP0179913 - LARGE LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUKAWA, Hideki 5-34, Shibagaki 2-chome Matsubara-shi Osaka-fu 580 / JP | 02 /
MASUYAMA, Takeshi 3-3, Hiyoshidai Niban-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu 569 / JP | 03 /
HIROTA, Minoru 15-14, Takayanagi 3-chome Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu 572 / JP | 04 /
WAKAHATA, Yasuo 7-11, Myokenzaka 6-chome Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576 / JP | 05 /
ITOH, Masahiro 49-10, Higashi Funabashi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu 573 / JP | 06 /
HARADA, Shinji 6-108, Myokenzaka 6-chome Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576 / JP | [1993/22] |
Former [1986/19] | 01 /
MATSUKAWA, Hideki 5-34, Shibagaki 2-chome Matsubara-shi Osaka-fu 580 / JP | ||
02 /
MASUYAMA, Takeshi 3-3, Hiyoshidainiban-cho Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu 569 / JP | |||
03 /
HIROTA, Minoru 15-14, Takayanagi 3-chome Neyagawa-shi Osaka-fu 572 / JP | |||
04 /
WAKAHATA, Yasuo 7-11, Myokenzaka 6-chome Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576 / JP | |||
05 /
ITOH, Masahiro 49-10, Higashifunabashi 1-chome Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu 573 / JP | |||
06 /
HARADA, Shinji 6-108, Myokenzaka 6-chome Katano-shi Osaka-fu 576 / JP | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1986/19] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85901578.6 | 27.03.1985 | [1986/19] | WO1985JP00149 | Priority number, date | JP19840061479 | 28.03.1984 Original published format: JP 6147984 | [1986/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504505 | Date: | 10.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0179913 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0179913 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/35 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
G02F1/133524 (EP,US);
G09F9/35 (EP,US);
G02F1/13336 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/19] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT GROSSEN FLÜSSIGKRISTALLEN | [1986/19] | English: | LARGE LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [1986/19] | French: | AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES DE GRANDES DIMENSIONS | [1986/19] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.1985 | Translation filed | 27.11.1985 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.1985 | Search fee paid | 27.11.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 28.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58062625 ; | [X]US4299447 (SOLTAN PARVIZ, et al); | [XP]JPS59210418 (EPSON CORP) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 152 (P-208)[1297], 5th July 1983; & JP-A-58 062 625 (FUJITSU K.K.) 14-04-1983, & JP58062625 A 00000000 | International search | [P]JPS59123871 (EPSON CORP); | [P]JPS59105677 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [P]JPS59210477 (EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPS5922089 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS58184988 (JIYAN PORAARU); | [Y]JPS37281B ; | [Y]JPS4020752B ; | [Y]JPS4319737Y | Examination | JPS37281B |