EP0177617 - JUNCTION SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN represented by PRESIDENT OF TOHOKU UNIVERSITY 1-1 Katahira 2-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | [1986/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Hiromasa 390-82, Aza-Aoba Aramaki, Sendai-shi Miyagi 980 / JP | 02 /
INABA, Humio 13-1, Yagiyama-Minami 1-chome Sendai-shi Miyagi 982 / JP | [1986/16] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [1986/16] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 85901581.0 | 28.03.1985 | [1986/16] | WO1985JP00152 | Priority number, date | JP19840058159 | 28.03.1984 Original published format: JP 5815984 | [1986/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8504531 | Date: | 10.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0177617 | Date: | 16.04.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0177617 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19, H01L33/00 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
H01L33/24 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/06209 (EP,US);
H01S5/18347 (EP,US);
H01S5/185 (EP,US);
H01S5/0264 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1986/16] | H01S3/18, H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1986/16] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDES HALBLEITERELEMENT MIT SPERRSCHICHT | [1986/16] | English: | JUNCTION SEMICONDUCTOR LIGHT-EMITTING ELEMENT | [1986/16] | French: | ELEMENT PHOTO-EMETTEUR A SEMICONDUCTEUR A JONCTION | [1986/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.1985 | Translation filed | 12.09.1985 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.1985 | Search fee paid | 12.09.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1985 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5791574 | [XP] - OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, ECOC '84, TENTH EUROPEA CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, 3rd-6th September 1984, Stuttgart, pages 56-57, North-Holland Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; H. ITO et al.: "New structure of laser diode and light emitting diode based on coaxial transverse junction (CTJ)" | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 18, no. 12, 1979, pages 2329-2330, Tokyo, JP; H. SODA et al.: "GaInAsP/InP surface emitting injection lasers" | [A] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 20, no. 8, August 1981, pages L563-L566, Tokyo, JP; H. OKUDA et al.: "GaInAsP/InP surface emitting injection laser with buried heterostructures" | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 176 (E-130)[1054], 10th September 1982; & JP - A - 57 91 574 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 07-06-1982, & JP5791574 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]JPS4214260B ; | [Y]JPS5367391 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPS57199288 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [Y]JPS58135690 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN); | [P]JPS59152684 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [P]JPS59154087 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) |